UT HCR003 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Italian-american Heritage Month Concurrent Resolution

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Italian-american Heritage Month Concurrent Resolution

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-01 House/ to Governor in EGOV
2010-02-25 Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK
2010-02-23 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2010-02-22 House/ received from Senate in HSPKR
2010-02-22 Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR
2010-02-22 House/ to Senate in SPRES
2010-02-19 House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL
2010-02-18 Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK
2010-02-17 Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD
2010-02-16 Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2010-02-12 Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTWED
2010-02-09 Senate/ to standing committee in SSTWED
2010-02-08 Senate/ received from House in SINTRO
2010-02-04 House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC
2010-02-01 House/ placed on Time Certain Calendar in HSPEC
2010-02-01 House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTNAE
2010-01-29 House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTNAE
2010-01-25 House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2009-12-29 House/ to Printing with fiscal note in LRGC
2009-12-29 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC
2009-12-17 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC
2009-11-19 LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback