UT HCR002 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution Encouraging Discussion about Prevention of Child Sexual Abuse
Title
Concurrent Resolution Encouraging Discussion about Prevention of Child Sexual Abuse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-01-28 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-01-28 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-01-28 | House | House/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-28 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-24 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-24 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-12 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-05 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-03 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-03 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Abuse, Neglect, or Dependency
Child Welfare
Commission on Criminal and Juvenile Justice
Crimes
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Legislative Operations
Resolutions
Sexual Offenses
Child Welfare
Commission on Criminal and Juvenile Justice
Crimes
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Legislative Operations
Resolutions
Sexual Offenses