UT HB2003 | 2021 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-16 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-16 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pretrial Amendments
Title
Pretrial Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-16 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-11-15 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-11-15 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-11-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-11-12 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-11-12 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-11-10 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-11-10 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2021-11-10 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2021-11-10 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-11-10 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-11-10 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-11-10 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-11-10 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-11-10 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-11-10 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-11-10 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-11-10 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-11-09 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-11-09 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-11-09 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-11-09 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-11-08 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-11-08 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-11-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 3 | 920 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 22 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 32 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 32 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31A | 1 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31A | 35 | 504 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63M | 7 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 17 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 20 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 20 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 20 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 20 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 20 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 20 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 20 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78A | 2 | 220 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78A | 7 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78B | 22 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78B | 7 | 802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78B | 9 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |