UT HB2002 | 2011 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-28 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-28 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prison Relocation and Development Authority Act Amendments
Title
Prison Relocation and Development Authority Act Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-28 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2011-07-21 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-07-21 | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in HCLERK | |
2011-07-21 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2011-07-21 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2011-07-21 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2011-07-20 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-07-20 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-07-20 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2011-07-20 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2011-07-20 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2011-07-20 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2011-07-20 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-07-20 | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in SPRES | |
2011-07-20 | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL | |
2011-07-20 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2011-07-20 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2011-07-20 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK | |
2011-07-20 | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND | |
2011-07-20 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2011-07-20 | Senate/ lifted from Rules in S2ND | |
2011-07-20 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-07-20 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2011-07-20 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-07-20 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2011-07-20 | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB | |
2011-07-20 | House/ circled in H3RDHB | |
2011-07-20 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-07-20 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDHB | |
2011-07-20 | House/ lifted from Rules in HSTRUL | |
2011-07-20 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-07-20 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HINTRO | |
2011-07-20 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-07-20 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in LRGC | |
2011-07-20 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2011-07-20 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2011-07-15 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-07-15 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-07-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Business
Business Development
Department of Corrections
Land Use
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Special Session
State Boards, Commissions, and Councils
Business Development
Department of Corrections
Land Use
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Special Session
State Boards, Commissions, and Councils