UT HB1002 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Juvenile Justice Amendments
Title
Juvenile Justice Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-05-24 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-05-24 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-05-20 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-05-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-05-20 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-05-20 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-05-19 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2021-05-19 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2021-05-19 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-05-19 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Secretary |
2021-05-19 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-05-19 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ 2nd suspended in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-05-19 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-05-17 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-05-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Department of Corrections
Department of Human Services
Human Services
Judicial Operations
Juvenile Justice
Juvenile Justice Services
Juveniles
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Department of Human Services
Human Services
Judicial Operations
Juvenile Justice
Juvenile Justice Services
Juveniles
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62A | 7 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 41 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78A | 6 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78A | 6 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78A | 6 | 705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 1 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 6 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 6 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 6 | 504 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 6 | 505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 6 | 507 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 6 | 804 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |