UT HB0491 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Law Enforcement Court Order Reporting Amendments
Title
Law Enforcement Court Order Reporting Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Wilcox [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-02 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-28 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-28 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Data and Cyber Security
Electronic Information
Electronic Privacy
Government Records
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Peace Officers
Public Safety
Public Utilities and Technology
Technology
Electronic Information
Electronic Privacy
Government Records
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Peace Officers
Public Safety
Public Utilities and Technology
Technology
Code Citations
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2022/bills/static/HB0491.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2022/bills/hbillint/HB0491.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2022/HB0491.fn.pdf |