UT HB0469 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-14 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-14 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Immigration Related Amendments
Title
Immigration Related Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 53 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 55 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 55 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-14 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-03-08 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2011-03-08 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-08 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2011-03-08 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-03-08 | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-03-04 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2011-03-04 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSEC | |
2011-03-03 | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-03 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-03 | House/ circled in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-03 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-02 | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-02 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-02 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTWED | |
2011-02-28 | House/ to standing committee in HSTWED | |
2011-02-28 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-02-25 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |