UT HB0454 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Higher Education Study
Title
Higher Education Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 39 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-03-11 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-11 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-11 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-11 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-11 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Education Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-11 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Education Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Education Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Education Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Education Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Education Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-01 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-01 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-01 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-03-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |