UT HB0451 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Opioid Use Prevention and Treatment Amendments
Title
Opioid Use Prevention and Treatment Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-23 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-21 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Department of Human Services
Government Operations (State Issues)
Health
Human Services
Local Substance Abuse Authorities
Opioids
Public Funds and Accounts
Substance Abuse
Substance Abuse and Mental Health
Substance Use Disorder Treatment
Government Operations (State Issues)
Health
Human Services
Local Substance Abuse Authorities
Opioids
Public Funds and Accounts
Substance Abuse
Substance Abuse and Mental Health
Substance Use Disorder Treatment
Code Citations
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2022/bills/static/HB0451.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2022/bills/hbillint/HB0451.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2022/HB0451.fn.pdf |