UT HB0450 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-21 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-21 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hospital Provider Tax Amendments
Title
Hospital Provider Tax Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-21 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2011-03-16 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2011-03-15 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-10 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in SPRES | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-03-10 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTRUL | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2011-03-09 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2011-03-09 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-09 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-09 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-09 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-03-09 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |