UT HB0448 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Custody Modifications
Title
Custody Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 68 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ motion to reconsider (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 9 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ motion to reconsider (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 9 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2012-03-16 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2012-03-15 | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in HCLERK | |
2012-03-15 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2012-03-15 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-03-13 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-09 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-09 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-09 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2012-03-09 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2012-03-09 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2012-03-09 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2012-03-08 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2012-03-08 | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in SPRES | |
2012-03-08 | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL | |
2012-03-08 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ floor amendment in S3RD | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in S3RD | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ motion to reconsider in SSEC | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ failed in SSEC | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ floor amendment in S3RD | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2012-03-07 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2012-03-07 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2012-03-06 | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2012-03-02 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-03-01 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2012-03-01 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2012-02-29 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2012-02-29 | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-29 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-21 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-21 | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTLAW | |
2012-02-21 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTLAW | |
2012-02-21 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTLAW | |
2012-02-17 | House/ to standing committee in HSTLAW | |
2012-02-17 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-16 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-16 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-14 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-14 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-02-13 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-13 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |