UT HB0446 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local District Tax Amendments
Title
Local District Tax Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Curtis Bramble [R] | Rep. Derek Brown [R] | Rep. Brad Dee [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-03-16 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2011-03-09 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-09 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2011-03-09 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2011-03-09 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2011-03-04 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-03-04 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-03-04 | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-02 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-02 | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-01 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTPOL | |
2011-02-28 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTPOL | |
2011-02-28 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTPOL | |
2011-02-25 | House/ to standing committee in HSTPOL | |
2011-02-25 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-02-25 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |