UT HB0442 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Family Leave Amendments
Title
Family Leave Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-11 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House Comm - Held in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-04 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-28 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-28 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Department of Human Resource Management
Executive Branch
Government Operations (State Issues)
Higher Education
State Board of Regents
State Officers and Employees
Executive Branch
Government Operations (State Issues)
Higher Education
State Board of Regents
State Officers and Employees
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/static/HB0442.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/hbillint/HB0442.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2019/HB0442.fn.pdf |