UT HB0438 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Law Enforcement Use of Biometric Information
Title
Law Enforcement Use of Biometric Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - House - House Comm - Returned to Rules (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-08 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-03-04 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-04 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-27 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |