UT HB0433 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Attorney General Authority Amendments
Title
Attorney General Authority Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-28 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-17 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-17 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Attorney General
Constitutional Officers
Counties
Government Operations (State Issues)
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Constitutional Officers
Counties
Government Operations (State Issues)
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Code Citations
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2022/bills/static/HB0433.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2022/bills/hbillint/HB0433.pdf |