UT HB0432 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute Historic Pioneer Trail Preservation
Title
Substitute Historic Pioneer Trail Preservation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2015-03-12 | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-10 | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-10 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Consent Calendar |
2015-03-10 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2015-03-10 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2015-03-06 | House | House Comm - Held in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2015-03-06 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2015-03-05 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | |
2015-02-26 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-02-26 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |