UT HB0429 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Specie Legal Tender Amendments
Title
Specie Legal Tender Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Cox [R] | Sen. Scott Jenkins [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2016-03-10 | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-07 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2016-03-07 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-03-07 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Business and Labor Committee |
2016-03-07 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2016-03-07 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2016-02-29 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2016-02-26 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-26 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-24 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-24 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-02-24 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-02-24 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |