UT HB0429 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-09 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-09 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Newspaper Publication Requirements
Title
Newspaper Publication Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 4 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2010-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | House/ filed in HFILE | |
2010-03-09 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2010-03-09 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2010-03-08 | Senate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL | |
2010-03-05 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2010-03-05 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2010-03-05 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-03-04 | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-03 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTJUD | |
2010-03-01 | House/ to standing committee in HSTJUD | |
2010-02-26 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-26 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-24 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HDOCKET | |
2010-02-23 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |