UT HB0428 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fireworks Amendments
Title
Fireworks Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Welton [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-02-23 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2024-02-24 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2024-02-23 | House | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2024-02-23 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2024-01-30 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-30 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-30 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-29 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-29 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | 7 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 7 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |