UT HB0428 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Water Issues Task Force
Title
Water Issues Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-03-16 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2011-03-11 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-10 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2011-03-10 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-03-10 | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND | |
2011-03-09 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2011-03-07 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2011-03-04 | House/ lifted from Rules in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-03 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTPUT | |
2011-03-02 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTPUT | |
2011-03-02 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTPUT | |
2011-03-01 | House/ to standing committee in HSTPUT | |
2011-03-01 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-03-01 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |