UT HB0425 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Political Activities Amendments
Title
Political Activities Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Daw [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2016-03-10 | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-09 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Rules Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Government Operations Committee |
2016-03-04 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Government Operations Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Government Operations Committee |
2016-03-01 | House | House Comm - Held in House Government Operations Committee |
2016-02-29 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2016-02-26 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-25 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-24 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-23 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-02-23 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-02-23 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |