UT HB0423 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Transit and Road Funding Amendments
Title
Transit and Road Funding Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-06 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-02-27 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-02-27 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-02-27 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-02-27 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Transportation Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Transportation Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Transportation Committee |
2018-02-23 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Transportation Committee |
2018-02-23 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-23 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-22 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-20 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-20 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-20 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-20 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Transit Districts
Revenue and Taxation
Sales and Use Tax
Transportation
Public Transit Districts
Revenue and Taxation
Sales and Use Tax
Transportation