UT HB0414 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-28 - Governor Vetoed in HCLERK
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-28 - Governor Vetoed in HCLERK
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School Bonding for Seismic Purposes
Title
School Bonding for Seismic Purposes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 43 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 38 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 38 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | Governor Vetoed in HCLERK | |
2012-03-16 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2012-03-16 | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in HCLERK | |
2012-03-16 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2012-03-16 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-03-14 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-09 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-09 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-09 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2012-03-08 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2012-03-08 | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in SPRES | |
2012-03-08 | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL | |
2012-03-08 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND | |
2012-03-07 | Senate/ circled in S2ND | |
2012-03-07 | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND | |
2012-03-07 | Senate/ circled in S2ND | |
2012-03-07 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2012-03-06 | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2012-03-02 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-03-01 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2012-03-01 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2012-03-01 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2012-03-01 | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB | |
2012-03-01 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-29 | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-29 | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-29 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-29 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTPOL | |
2012-02-29 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTPOL | |
2012-02-28 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTPOL | |
2012-02-27 | House/ to standing committee in HSTPOL | |
2012-02-27 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-27 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-22 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-22 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-02-21 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-21 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |