UT HB0401 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Higher Education Criminal Background Amendments
Title
Higher Education Criminal Background Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Val Potter [R] | Sen. Don Ipson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-06 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2018-03-02 | House | House/ 2nd suspended in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-03-02 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-03-02 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-02-27 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-02-27 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Education Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Education Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Education Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Education Committee |
2018-02-20 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-19 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-15 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-15 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-14 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-14 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-14 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |