UT HB0400 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Traumatic Head and Spinal Cord Injury Rehabilitation Fund
Title
Traumatic Head and Spinal Cord Injury Rehabilitation Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Senate/ substituted in SSUB | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2012-03-07 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2012-03-07 | Senate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL | |
2012-03-02 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-03-01 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2012-03-01 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2012-03-01 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2012-03-01 | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB | |
2012-03-01 | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB | |
2012-03-01 | House/ circled in H3RDHB | |
2012-03-01 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-29 | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-29 | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-29 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-29 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-27 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-23 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-23 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTHHS | |
2012-02-22 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTHHS | |
2012-02-21 | House/ to standing committee in HSTHHS | |
2012-02-21 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-21 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-02-20 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-20 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |