UT HB0400 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regulation of Mining Operations
Title
Regulation of Mining Operations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 56 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 56 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2011-03-16 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2011-03-15 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-10 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES | |
2011-03-09 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-03-04 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-03-04 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-03-04 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-02 | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-02 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-01 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTNAE | |
2011-02-28 | House/ to standing committee in HSTNAE | |
2011-02-25 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-25 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-24 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-02-23 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |