UT HB0396 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTWED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTWED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Speech-language Pathology and Audiology Licensing Act Amendments
Title
Speech-language Pathology and Audiology Licensing Act Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Don Ipson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTWED | |
2010-03-01 | House/ to standing committee in HSTWED | |
2010-02-27 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-26 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-25 | House/ received from Senate in LRGC | |
2010-02-25 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0396.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/hbillint/hb0396.pdf |