UT HB0385 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tax Reform Revisions
Title
Tax Reform Revisions
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Quinn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-06 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2018-02-20 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-19 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-13 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-13 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/static/HB0385.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/hbillint/HB0385.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2018/HB0385.fn.pdf |