UT HB0385 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Sales and Use Tax - Seller Notice Requirements
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Seller Notice Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-17 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 5 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-13 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-02-13 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | House/ filed in HFILE | |
2012-03-08 | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK | |
2012-03-01 | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ amended in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-29 | House Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTREV | |
2012-02-17 | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in HSTREV | |
2012-02-17 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTREV | |
2012-02-13 | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in HSTREV | |
2012-02-13 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTREV | |
2012-02-09 | House/ to standing committee in HSTREV | |
2012-02-09 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-09 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-08 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-07 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-07 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-02-06 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-06 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |