UT HB0382 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Escalante Region Grazing Zone
Title
Escalante Region Grazing Zone
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2013-03-25 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2013-03-22 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK |
2013-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-19 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-14 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-14 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2013-03-14 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2013-03-14 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in SPRES |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in SSTREV |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTREV |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2013-03-05 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-03-05 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-03-04 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-03-04 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTNAE |
2013-03-04 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTNAE |
2013-03-04 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTNAE |
2013-03-01 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTNAE |
2013-02-28 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2013-02-28 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2013-02-28 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL |
2013-02-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-02-28 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-02-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-02-27 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |