UT HB0372 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Refiner Reporting Provisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Refiner Reporting Provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-26 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 1 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2016-03-10 House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2016-03-09HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House Rules Committee
2016-03-09HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in House Rules Committee
2016-03-08HouseHouse Comm - Returned to Rules in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2016-03-08HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2016-02-26HouseBill Substituted by Standing Committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2016-02-26HouseHouse Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2016-02-26HouseHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2016-02-25HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2016-02-24HouseLFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2016-02-22HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2016-02-18HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2016-02-17HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2016-02-17 House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2016-02-16 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2016-02-16 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback