UT HB0372 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Law Enforcement Notification Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law Enforcement Notification Amendments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ filed in HFILE
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK
2014-02-25HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL
2014-02-24HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL
2014-02-24HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL
2014-02-20HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2014-02-20HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK
2014-02-19 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2014-02-19 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC
2014-02-19 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback