UT HB0370 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bail Bond Amendments
Title
Bail Bond Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - House/ failed (Y: 36 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - House/ failed (Y: 36 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2011-03-16 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2011-03-15 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-10 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2011-03-10 | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in SPRES | |
2011-03-10 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2011-03-09 | Senate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2011-03-07 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2011-03-07 | House/ uncircled in HCLERK | |
2011-03-07 | House/ motion to reconsider passed in HCLERK | |
2011-03-04 | House/ filed in HFILE | |
2011-03-04 | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-04 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-04 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-03 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-03 | House/ 2nd reading in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-02 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTBUS | |
2011-03-01 | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS | |
2011-03-01 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-03-01 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-03-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |