UT HB0364 | 2020 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Abortion Revisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House/ circled (Y: 41 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 4 to # 5 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 47 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 3 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2020-03-12HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2020-03-12HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2020-03-12HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2020-03-12HouseHouse/ circled in House Concurrence Calendar
2020-03-12HouseHouse/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar
2020-03-12HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2020-03-12HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2020-03-10HouseSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in House Speaker
2020-03-10SenateSenate/ floor amendment # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-10SenateSenate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-10SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-10SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-10SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-10SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-09SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-09SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2020-03-09SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2020-03-09SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 4 to # 5 in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2020-03-09SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2020-03-06SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2020-03-06SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2020-03-06SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2020-03-05SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2020-03-05SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2020-03-05HouseHouse/ floor amendment # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-03-05HouseHouse/ substituted from # 3 to # 4 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-03-05HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-03-03HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-03-03HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Judiciary Committee
2020-03-03HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Judiciary Committee
2020-03-03HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 3 in House Judiciary Committee
2020-02-28HouseHouse Comm - Held in House Judiciary Committee
2020-02-27HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee
2020-02-24HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2020-02-20HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2020-02-20HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2020-02-19 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-02-19 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/static/HB0364.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0364.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0364S03.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0364S04.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillamd/HB0364S04.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0364S05.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillamd/HB0364S05.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0364.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0364S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0364S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0364S03.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0364S04.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0364S05.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=16415
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=16417
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2020GS&voteid=794&house=H
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=17122
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=17123
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2020GS&voteid=1366&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2020GS&voteid=1255&house=H

Bill Comments

feedback