UT HB0359 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dental Billing Amendments
Title
Dental Billing Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-11 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-11 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-11 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-05 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-05 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-03 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2021-03-03 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2021-03-03 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-02-22 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-22 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-22 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2021-02-21 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Consent Calendar |
2021-02-19 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2021-02-19 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substitute/ amended/ Consent Cal in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-12 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-12 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Dentists and Dental Hygienists
Health
Health Benefits and Claims
Health Care Professionals
Health Insurance
Health
Health Benefits and Claims
Health Care Professionals
Health Insurance