UT HB0356 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0356S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
New Convention Facility Development Incentive Provisions
Title
New Convention Facility Development Incentive Provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-03-03 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | House | House/ substituted in HSUB |
2014-03-03 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2014-02-27 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2014-02-27 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-19 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-19 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTEDW |
2014-02-19 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTEDW |
2014-02-18 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTEDW |
2014-02-18 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTEDW |
2014-02-18 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDW |
2014-02-18 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2014-02-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-02-18 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HCLERK |
2014-02-18 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2014-02-17 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-02-17 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0356S01 (Replaced by) 2014-04-02 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Subjects
Business Development
Economic Development
Hotels and Hotel Keepers
Income Tax
Property Tax
Revenue and Taxation
Sales and Use Tax
Economic Development
Hotels and Hotel Keepers
Income Tax
Property Tax
Revenue and Taxation
Sales and Use Tax