UT HB0355 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - House/ substituted by Rules in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - House/ substituted by Rules in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hospital-acquired Infections
Title
Hospital-acquired Infections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | House/ substituted by Rules in HSUB | |
2011-02-11 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-09 | House/ held for reconsideration in HINTRO | |
2011-02-08 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0355.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/bills/hbillint/hb0355.pdf |