UT HB0354 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic Beverage Amendments
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-28 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSUB | |
2012-02-28 | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB | |
2012-02-27 | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTREV | |
2012-02-27 | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTREV | |
2012-02-23 | House/ to standing committee in HSTREV | |
2012-02-22 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-22 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-02-22 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-22 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-22 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0354.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/bills/hbillint/hb0354.pdf |