UT HB0351 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Homeless Coordinating Committee Modifications
Title
Homeless Coordinating Committee Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2011-03-15 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2011-03-09 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-08 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES | |
2011-03-03 | Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTTPT | |
2011-03-01 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTTPT | |
2011-03-01 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2011-02-28 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2011-02-24 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-02-23 | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTBUS | |
2011-02-22 | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS | |
2011-02-18 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-18 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-18 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-02-17 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |