UT HB0348 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Secondhand Merchandise Dealers Amendments
Title
Secondhand Merchandise Dealers Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 4 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 4 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2018-03-16 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2018-03-15 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-13 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-03-13 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-03-13 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-03-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2018-03-09 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2018-03-09 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-08 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-08 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 7 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ placed back on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ placed back on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate Consent Calendar |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 4 in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2018-03-02 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-02 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-02 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2018-02-28 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2018-02-28 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal in House Business and Labor Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Business and Labor Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-12 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-12 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-07 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-07 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-07 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |