UT HB0348 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hazardous Waste Amendments
Title
Hazardous Waste Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2012-02-10 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | House/ substituted in HSUB | |
2012-02-23 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-13 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-13 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTNAE | |
2012-02-10 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTNAE | |
2012-02-08 | House/ to standing committee in HSTNAE | |
2012-02-08 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-07 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-07 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-07 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-07 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-02-06 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-06 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |