UT HB0344 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Program Eligibility Amendments
Title
Program Eligibility Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | House Comm - Held in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-15 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-10 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-10 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Department of Health
Department of Workforce Services
Health
Medicaid
Medical Assistance Programs
Public Assistance
Workforce Services
Department of Workforce Services
Health
Medicaid
Medical Assistance Programs
Public Assistance
Workforce Services
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | 18 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 18 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |