UT HB0340 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Telehealth Revisions
Title
Telehealth Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2016-03-10 | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-10 | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2016-03-01 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2016-03-01 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2016-03-01 | House | House/ substituted from # 1 to # 3 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-03-01 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-03-01 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-03-01 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-03-01 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-03-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-26 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-22 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-22 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2016-02-22 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2016-02-22 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2016-02-22 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2016-02-19 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2016-02-19 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-16 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-15 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-02-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |