UT HB0339 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Charter School Enrollment Amendments
Title
Charter School Enrollment Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 47 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House/ failed (Y: 37 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House/ failed (Y: 37 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | House/ filed in HFILE | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2011-03-07 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2011-03-07 | House/ circled in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-07 | House/ motion to reconsider in HCLERK | |
2011-03-07 | House/ failed in HCLERK | |
2011-03-07 | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-04 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-03 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-03 | House/ 2nd reading in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-03 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTEDU | |
2011-03-02 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTEDU | |
2011-03-01 | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDU | |
2011-03-01 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-03-01 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |