UT HB0336 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-21 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-21 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Professional Licensing During a Declared Emergency
Title
Medical Professional Licensing During a Declared Emergency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-21 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2011-03-16 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2011-03-07 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-04 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-04 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2011-03-04 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES | |
2011-03-03 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2011-03-02 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTHHS | |
2011-02-28 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-25 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-02-24 | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB | |
2011-02-22 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-02-22 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTLAW | |
2011-02-16 | House/ to standing committee in HSTLAW | |
2011-02-15 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-15 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-10 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-02-09 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |