UT HB0333 | 2019 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Workforce Development Incentives Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workforce Development Incentives Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2019-03-14HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2019-03-11HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ amended in House Rules Committee
2019-03-11HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee
2019-03-08HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee
2019-03-08HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee
2019-03-05HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee
2019-02-19HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2019-02-13 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2019-02-13 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2019-02-13 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback