UT HB0331 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School Board Election Provisions
Title
School Board Election Provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Nielson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | House/ filed in HFILE | |
2012-03-08 | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK | |
2012-03-02 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL | |
2012-03-02 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2012-03-01 | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2012-03-01 | House Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTEDU | |
2012-02-29 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTEDU | |
2012-02-27 | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDU | |
2012-02-24 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-24 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-02-24 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-24 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-24 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Counties
Education
Elections
Local Boards of Education
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Education
State Board of Education
Education
Elections
Local Boards of Education
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Education
State Board of Education
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0331.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/bills/hbillint/hb0331.pdf |