UT HB0330 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Peace Officer Pay Plan Amendments
Title
Peace Officer Pay Plan Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Perry [R] | Sen. Wayne Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-02-26 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-02-26 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2020-02-26 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-02-21 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-02-21 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2020-02-14 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2020-02-13 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-02-13 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-13 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-13 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Department of Human Resource Management
Government Operations (State Issues)
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Peace Officers
Public Safety
State Officers and Employees
Government Operations (State Issues)
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Peace Officers
Public Safety
State Officers and Employees