UT HB0330 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute Interlocal Entities Revisions
Title
Substitute Interlocal Entities Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - House - House/ failed (Y: 30 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2015-03-03 | House/ failed in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-03 | House | House/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-03-03 | House | House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-03-03 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-03-03 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-03-03 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-02-27 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-02-25 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-02-24 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-02-24 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2015-02-24 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2015-02-24 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2015-02-13 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2015-02-13 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | |
2015-02-12 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-02-12 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |