UT HB0328 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

State Government Work Week

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Government Work Week

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-07 - Senate - Senate/ override Governor's veto (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - House/ override Governor's veto (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 62 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 63 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-09 House/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV
2011-05-07 Senate/ override Governor's veto in SSEC
2011-05-06 Senate/ circled in S3RD
2011-05-06 House/ to Senate in SSEC
2011-05-06 House/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB
2011-03-18 House/ to Governor in EGOV
2011-03-17 Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK
2011-03-10 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2011-03-10 House/ received from Senate in HSPKR
2011-03-10 Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR
2011-03-10 House/ to Senate in SPRES
2011-03-10 House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL
2011-03-10 Senate/ to House in HCLERK
2011-03-10 Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND
2011-03-10 Senate/ uncircled in S2ND
2011-03-10 Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2011-03-09 Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in SSTRUL
2011-03-09 Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND
2011-03-09 Senate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL
2011-03-01 Senate/ received from House in SINTRO
2011-03-01 House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC
2011-03-01 House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
2011-02-25 House/ committee report favorable in HSTGOC
2011-02-23 House/ to standing committee in HSTGOC
2011-02-22 House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL
2011-02-22 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL
2011-02-18 House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO
2011-02-17 Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC
2011-02-05 Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC
2011-02-04 Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback